THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 21:19:34 PM
Kashgari, Alia Yousif Ashour
CPSO#:
84142
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioners Road East
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Division of Respirology
Room E6-206
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 685 8094
Fax: 519 667 6790
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Aug 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:05 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALIA YOUSIF ASHOUR KASHGARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASHGARI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2006 to 09 Jun 2006
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 02 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Respirology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2011 |