THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:03:59 AM
Khan, Asifjehan
CPSO#:
84118
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Asifjehan Khan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Apr 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASIFJEHAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2006 |