THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 0:03:16 AM
Maze, Dawn Catherine
CPSO#:
84116
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sheppard, Dawn Catherine (used until: 08 Mar 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:06 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAWN CATHERINE MAZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 03 Apr 2006 to 28 Apr 2006
EL - Hematology
Queen's University, 04 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
EL - Hematology
Queen's University, 07 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2008
EL - Infectious Diseases
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Apr 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Jul 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2009 |