THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:43:54 AM
Millington, Scott Jeffrey
CPSO#:
84115
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
Box 207
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79830
Fax: (613) 737-8890
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SCOTT JEFFREY MILLINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLINGTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
EL - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Apr 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |