THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:51:38 PM
Wania, Hormuzshaw Jamshed
CPSO#:
84097
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 592-2272
Fax: (905) 336-9627
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Oct 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2010 |
|
Active |