THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:46:18 AM
Contreras Dominguez, Vladimir
CPSO#:
84094
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
Room D105
1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-5164
Fax: (613) 761-4036
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Nov 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2006 to 09 May 2006
PEAP - CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 May 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Aug 2008
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Ottawa, 17 Nov 2008 to 16 Feb 2009
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 May 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2016 |
|
Active |