THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:36:53 PM
Bin, James Chung-Yau
CPSO#:
84091
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
Suite K-304, 650 Sammon Ave
Toronto ON M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 469-3325
Fax: (416) 469-8221
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES CHUNG-YAU BIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2006 to 09 Apr 2006
EL - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |