THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:08:21 PM
Abunaji, Mohamed Abdusalam
CPSO#:
84081
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
EMG Lab/Neurology clinic
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6858
Fax: (905) 813-4046
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mohamed Abunaji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 30 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:16 Aug 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ABDUSALAM ABUNAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABUNAJI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Mar 2006 to 21 May 2006
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 22 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 16 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2010 to 16 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Aug 2012
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2011 |