THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:09:52 PM
Rosenberg, Eli
CPSO#:
84069
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kyla J. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Feb 2006 to 12 Mar 2006
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Apr 2010 to 08 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2013 |