THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:29:35 AM
Rush, Carolina Ana Estefania
CPSO#:
84064
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Spanish
Education: National University of Tucuman, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Multiple Sclerosis Clinic
501 Smyth Road
Box 606
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8532 Ext. 0
Fax: (613) 739-6631
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:22 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINA ANA ESTEFANIA RUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2006 to 06 Apr 2006
PEAP - CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 14 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Apr 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2014 |