THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 18:21:44 PM
Rodwan, Omar Mohamed Abdalla
CPSO#:
84063
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dr. F. Wigmore Regional Hospital
55 Diefenbaker Drive
Moose Jaw SK S6J 1M5
Phone: (306) 631-2328
Fax: (306) 691-5966
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMAR MOHAMED ABDALLA RODWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RODWAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2006 to 12 May 2006
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 13 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 05 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2013 |