THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 2:38:07 AM
Sabbagh, Roland
CPSO#:
84050
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
570 Lacolle Way
Orleans Cardiopulmonary group
Orléans ON K4A 0N9
Phone: (613) 699-3376
Fax: (613) 841-6770
Electoral District: 07
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Accuro
1B-700 Industrial Avenue
Ottawa, ON
K1G 0Y9
Tel: (613) 738-1242
Fax: (613) 738-0562
Date Received: 24 Aug 2011
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Oct 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROLAND SABBAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABBAGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2006 |