THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:16:40 AM
Biyong, Issack
CPSO#:
84047
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
08 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Universite De Yaounde I, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Wellmedica Medical Centre
7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8B7
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Issack Biyong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Oct 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2006 to 14 Mar 2006
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2006 to 14 Feb 2007
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jun 2014 |