THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:45:18 AM
Roopnarian, Indra Purbhoo Nath
CPSO#:
84046
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Mar 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Drive - Suite 405
Newmarket ON L3Y 6P5
Phone: 905 898 2240
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. INDRA PURBHOO NATH ROOPNARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROOPNARIAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 09 Feb 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2007 |