THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:08:34 PM
de Vrijer, Barbra
CPSO#:
84045
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 Feb 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: Erasmus University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital, Room B2-412
800 Commisioners Road E
PO Box 5010
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6106
Fax: (519) 646-6213
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:27 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Mar 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2021 |
|
Active |