THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:09:05 AM
Beattie, David Allan
CPSO#:
84032
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5 Home Street
Brockville ON K6V 0A5
Phone: (613) 423-1111
Fax: (613) 423-1112
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Feb 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ALLAN BEATTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEATTIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 12 Feb 2006 to 06 Apr 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 07 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 11 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 12 Feb 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2008 |