THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:00:51 AM
Feerasta, Sharmeen Hakim
CPSO#:
84005
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Aga Khan University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8333 Weston Rd
Vaughan Pediatric Clinic
Woodbridge ON L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-3250
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sharmeen Feerasta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking for a copy of their medical record should direct their written request to Dr. Sharmeen Feerasta. The request can be faxed to: 416-497-0712 Address to access records:
212-4800 Leslie Street, Toronto ON M2J 2K9
[email protected]
Phone: 416-497-1987
Date Received: 01 Sep 2020
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHARMEEN HAKIM FEERASTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEERASTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2007 |