THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 8:06:05 AM
Dhaliwal, Harinder Singh
CPSO#:
84003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A1-Endoscopy
1053 Carling Avenue
The Ottawa Hospital--Civic Campus
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16723
Fax: (613) 761-4020
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HARINDER SINGH DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2006 to 28 Feb 2006
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |