THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:39:34 AM
Akincioglu, Cigdem
CPSO#:
84000
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Academic Practice
as of
09 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Turkish
Education: Gazi University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Nuclear Medicine
C3 209
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3528
Fax: (519) 663-3860
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Turkey
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:03 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CIGDEM AKINCIOGLU may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. AKINCIOGLU holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. AKINCIOGLU may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AKINCIOGLU no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. AKINCIOGLU no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. AKINCIOGLU no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jan 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2011 |