THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 7:54:01 AM
Neira Aragon, Victor Manuel
CPSO#:
83994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Dalhousie University
Infirmary Hospital
1799 Robie St
Halifax NS B3H 3A7
Phone: 9024734326
Fax: 9024239454
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: V. Neira Aragon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Sep 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 01 Mar 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 02 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Sep 2007
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
|
Active |