THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:02:04 AM
Stevens, Liisa H
CPSO#:
83976
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hopital de Gatineau et Hull
909 boul la Vérendrye
Gatineau, Quebec
Gatineau QC J8P 7H2
Phone: (819) 966-6100
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jan 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIISA H STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2006 to 16 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2007 to 29 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2009 |