THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:42:02 AM
Gaba, Priya
CPSO#:
83955
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Russian
Education: Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
221 Nelson St
Ottawa ON K1N 1C7
Phone: 613-789-1500
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care |
Ottawa |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRIYA GABA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2006 to 07 May 2006
PEAP - R - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 08 May 2006 to 07 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 08 May 2007 to 07 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 May 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2012 |