THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 5:33:44 AM
Scheinemann, Katrin
CPSO#:
83942
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
07 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Wurzburg, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. K. Scheinemann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 10 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2006 to 21 Feb 2006
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 22 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Nov 2013 |