THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:36:27 AM
Andonov, Igor
CPSO#:
83938
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Macedonian
Education: ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Owen Sound Hospital
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. I. Andonov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 25 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IGOR ANDONOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDONOV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 05 Dec 2005 to 26 Feb 2006
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2006 to 26 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2007 to 26 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2008 to 26 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2009 to 26 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2010 to 26 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 27 Feb 2011 to 27 Aug 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2014 |