THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:11:39 AM
Geumei, Ahmed Abd El-Salam
CPSO#:
83933
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ahmed Geumei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2012
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMED ABD EL-SALAM GEUMEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEUMEI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2020 |