THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:51:36 PM
Huidovici, Elia
CPSO#:
83919
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bulgarian, English, French, Romanian
Education: University of Bucharest, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-3335 Dougall Ave
Windsor ON N9E 1S8
Phone: 5192583478
Fax: 5199463435
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIA HUIDOVICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUIDOVICI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2007 |