THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:06:35 PM
Cheema, Amarpreet Singh
CPSO#:
83915
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners - Credit V
ER Dept
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058132200
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jan 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMARPREET SINGH CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2006 to 13 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 16 Jan 2007 to 15 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)