THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 3:33:20 AM
Hooshangi, Hedieh
CPSO#:
83913
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
Department of Anaesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEDIEH HOOSHANGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOSHANGI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 15 Feb 2006
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Feb 2007
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2008 |