THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 12:20:45 PM
Habteselassie, Biruk Yitbarek
CPSO#:
83910
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Amharic, English
Education: Addis Ababa University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9-6400 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON L5N 3E7
Phone: (905) 288-1045
Fax: 905 858-0111
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BIRUK YITBAREK HABTESELASSIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABTESELASSIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 2007 |