THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 15:41:25 PM
Azoubel, Gustavo Alberto Paes
CPSO#:
83908
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Ave east
Suite # 502
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (647) 748-8272
Fax: (647) 748-8273
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:25 Sep 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GUSTAVO ALBERTO PAES AZOUBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZOUBEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Feb 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2010 |