THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:18:33 AM
Chitte, Sachin Anil
CPSO#:
83907
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Queen's University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
105A-460 West Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa Derm Centre
Nepean ON K2E 0B8
Phone: 613-369-8369
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
St Vincent de Paul Hospital,Providence Continuing Care Centre |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SACHIN ANIL CHITTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHITTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
EL - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |