THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:42:56 AM
Gorja, Juliana
CPSO#:
83903
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Albanian, English
Education: Universiteti i Tiranes, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3030 Birchmount Rd
Birchmount Hospital
Surgery Department, Surgical Assist
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 4164952400
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIANA GORJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORJA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2006 to 13 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2008 |