THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:43:01 AM
Chang, Chih-Peng
CPSO#:
83901
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin, Taiwanese
Education: Taipei Medical College, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Rd., Unit 4
Scarborough ON M1H 2A7
Phone: (647) 350-6767
Fax: (647) 350-7679
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Taiwan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHIH-PENG CHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 02 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
International Specialist Physician - Orthopedic Surgery