THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:44:02 AM
Ibrahim, Nurain
CPSO#:
83900
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
410 Highway 8
Supercare Medical Centre
Stoney Creek ON L8G 1G2
Phone: 905-560-5537
Fax: 905-561-6018
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NURAIN IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 27 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 28 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2008 |