THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:25:49 PM
Gokhale, Sandhya Vijay
CPSO#:
83896
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Phone: (519) 743-2142
Fax: (519) 743-2405
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jan 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDHYA VIJAY GOKHALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOKHALE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 27 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 28 Mar 2006 to 15 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 16 Jan 2007 to 15 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2008 |