THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:07:00 AM
Steyn, Chris
CPSO#:
83890
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
123-725 Carmi Ave
Penticton BC V2A 3G8
Phone: 2504601576
Fax: 2509000309
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Steyn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRIS STEYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEYN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2011 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2005 |