THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 6:44:13 AM
Sandhu, Parampal Singh
CPSO#:
83886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON L6X 5E9
Phone: (905) 454-8866
Fax: (905) 454-6652
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PARAMPAL SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 02 Jan 2006 to 26 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 May 2006 to 26 Jun 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 27 Jun 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 07 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Mar 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |