THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:46:09 AM
Mirza, Nazneen Sultana
CPSO#:
83882
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Chittagong, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Phone: (519) 743-2142 Ext. 105
Fax: (519) 585-1756
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAZNEEN SULTANA MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 02 Jan 2006 to 26 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 27 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2007 |