THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:20:42 AM
Sayar, Mirwais Abdulla
CPSO#:
83880
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Pashto, Russian
Education: Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Phone: (519) 743-2142
Fax: (519) 579-0002
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 May 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIRWAIS ABDULLA SAYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2006 to 13 Mar 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2008 |