THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:26:46 AM
Gibson, Paul James
CPSO#:
83871
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Nov 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West
HSC 3N27
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76465
Fax: 905-521-1703
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL JAMES GIBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 05 Dec 2005 to 25 Dec 2005
EL - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 28 Jan 2006 to 24 Feb 2006
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Feb 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2008 |