THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 2:24:20 AM
Skladman, Irina
CPSO#:
83868
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: The Azerbaijan N.Narimanov Memorial Stat, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Family Practice
100 Main Street west
Hamilton ON L8P 1H6
Phone: 905-320-7526
Fax: (905) 637-1331
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IRINA SKLADMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKLADMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2005 to 13 Feb 2006
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 14 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 09 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |