THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 15:44:53 PM
Isaza-Zapata, Gloria Maria
CPSO#:
83863
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 May 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-Jan-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Antioquia, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gloria Isaza-Zapata Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Previous patients of Dr. Isaza-Zapata can contact Hamilton Health Sciences at 905-521-2100 ext. 75123 to obtain a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 09 Jan 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Dec 2005 to 21 Feb 2006
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 22 Feb 2006 to 30 Apr 2006
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Apr 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2019 |