THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:07:01 AM
Spencer Netto, Fernando Antonio Campelo
CPSO#:
83862
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Mar 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Building 411
7FVX+FJ6. Medical City
Trauma Surgery Office (Old Legal Bu
Doha
Qatar
Phone: 97444395777
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Fernando Spencer Netto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2013
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Qatar
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:25 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FERNANDO ANTONIO CAMPELO SPENCER NETTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCER NETTO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2005 to 23 Jan 2006
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 02 Jan 2008
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2019 |