THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:22:51 AM
Emmenegger, Urban Josef
CPSO#:
83857
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 May 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: University of Bern, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre, T2-054
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4928
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 May 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:13 Mar 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 24 Jan 2006
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 25 Jan 2006 to 30 Oct 2006
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Apr 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Mar 2014 |
|
Active |