THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:17:07 AM
Nodwell, Samuel Allan Trefor
CPSO#:
83807
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2936 Baseline Road, Suite 102
Ottawa ON K2H 1B3
Phone: 613-232-7777
Fax: 613-232-0777
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMUEL ALLAN TREFOR NODWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NODWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2005 |