THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:18:43 PM
Iyer, Vikram Sekar
CPSO#:
83797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44159
Fax: (905) 521-0440
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:06 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIKRAM SEKAR IYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IYER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 24 Oct 2005 to 18 Dec 2005
EL - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2009 |