THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:34:14 PM
Marginean, Esmeralda Celia
CPSO#:
83796
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Celia Marginean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Indiana
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:02 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Apr 2019 |