THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 17:03:55 PM
Tak, Farzana Yousuf
CPSO#:
83790
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Punjab, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3640 Wells st
windsor on
N9C1T9
Windsor ON N9C 4H4
Phone: (519)258 0484
Fax: 519 258 0488
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Oct 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FARZANA YOUSUF TAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Jan 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2010 |