THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:13:48 AM
Al Saati, Basem
CPSO#:
83765
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON L6M 0N2
Phone: (647) 745-2252
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Sep 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2005 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2011 |
|
Active |