THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:41:52 AM
Albert, Michel William
CPSO#:
83762
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Ave
cmpa
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 1-800-267-6522
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michel Albert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 17 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Sep 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHEL WILLIAM ALBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBERT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 27 Sep 2005 to 24 Oct 2005
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Oct 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2006 |